JOHN BURRILL ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity provides 7 homes for residents in peaceful, maintained gardens. Residents live rent free and make a modest contribution towards heating bills and the fabric. Each unit has an allotment if required. The Charity is independent and receives no regular financial help. Local organizations have helped with renovation and restoration programs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
Governance
- 13 January 1965: Standard registration
- JOHN BURRILL HOMES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rupert Crispin Dewhirst | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Batterton | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Wass | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
RON PEARSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.00k | £24.98k | £27.78k | £28.93k | £25.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.00k | £15.14k | £22.34k | £19.15k | £22.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 June 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 10 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF 27TH DAY OF FEBRUARY 1922.
Charitable objects
HAVING PROVIDED ALMHOUSES FOR RESIDENTS OF THE CITY OF YORK OVER SIXTY YEARS OF AGE TO MAINTAIN THE SAME AND TO PAY SMALL PENSIONS TO THE OCCUPANTS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF YORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mulberry PM
11 Walmgate
York
YO1 9TX
- Phone:
- 01904655200
- Email:
- info@mulberrypm.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window