THE NEW ALRESFORD TOWN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust's principal activities in New Alresford are:- Operating a local community minibus. Running markets in Broad Street. Lessor of the Old Fire Station. Maintaining the avenue and trees in Broad Street. Administering the Arthur Stowell History Fund. Operating a 99 year lease on the Eel House and finalising the restoration. The maintenance and development of the Alresford Museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,385 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hampshire
Governance
- 02 March 1965: Standard registration
- 13 February 2025: Funds received from 800643 THE EDWARD PAY MEDICAL FUND
- ALRESFORD TOWN TRUST (Working name)
- NEW ALRESFORD TOWN TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vanessa Jane Andrews | Chair | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Kenneth Lamboll Webb | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Jane Rawlings | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Robert Parker | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Helen Pinniger | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Orton | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ERNEST DAVID JEFFS | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROY GENTRY | Trustee | 01 April 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.80k | £42.72k | £53.36k | £45.99k | £38.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.47k | £41.26k | £42.88k | £37.21k | £38.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.81k | £22.85k | £2.71k | £3.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11/10/1989 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 12/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/07/2015
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF LAND, TREES, BUILDINGS AND DOCUMENTS IN NEW ALRESFORD AND FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NEW ALRESFORD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OLD AND NEW ALRESFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD FIRE STATION
54 BROAD STREET
ALRESFORD
SO24 9AN
- Phone:
- 01962733778
- Email:
- clerk@towntrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window