Governing document THE HEATH
Charity number: 239054

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PETERSFIELD, SHEET AND BURITON INCLOSURE AWARDS DATED 8TH NOVEMBER 1859, 19TH MARCH 1859, SCHEMES DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 1925, 25TH JUNE 1975 AND 19 MARCH 1998.
Charitable objects
LAND TO BE USED AT ALL TIMES AS A PLACE OF EXERCISE RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PETERSFIELD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.