Accounts and annual returns KIRKBYMOORSIDE AND DISTRICT AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity number: 239063
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 December 2023 07 February 2025 124 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 06 December 2022 05 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 06 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 06 December 2020 15 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 06 December 2019 29 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2019 Not Required