Accounts and annual returns BANBURY SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity Number: 239112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 17 July 2024 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required