HENRY SMITH FUND - SHERE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND ALSO TO LOCAL VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WHICH PROVIDE SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR ELDERLY PEOPLE IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF SHERE, SURREY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 October 1975: Standard registration
- 09 June 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 04 November 2011: Re-registered
- SHERE CHARITY FOR RELIEF IN NEED (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philippa Margaret Galloway | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Marguerite Sena | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Mary Roe | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Louise Main | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alissa Natalya Collingwood | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev TIMOTHY DANIEL HEANEY | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|||||
JAMES HUTTON | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.54k | £17.47k | £17.55k | £17.96k | £19.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.25k | £11.73k | £13.45k | £18.61k | £16.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 01 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 09/10/1975 AS AMENDED ON 10/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12/01/2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF SHERE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cottage
Lower Street
Shere
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU5 9HX
- Phone:
- 07929396533
- Email:
- clerk.hsfs@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window