THE INSTITUTE FOR ECLECTIC STUDY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to promote and encourage education in and around the study of eclectic philosophy, religion and humanism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VAN BUREN SCHELE | Chair |
|
||||||
Wilhelmina Elisabeth van Buren Schele-van Vledder | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE CHRISTINE VAN BUREN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £582 | £680 | £604 | £578 | £826 | |
|
Total expenditure | £306 | £2.31k | £237 | £321 | £281 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH FEBRUARY 1955
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE IN ENGLAND AND ELSEWHERE EDUCATION IN AND THE STUDY OF ECLECTIC PHILOSOPHY AND RELIGION AND HUMANISM. (B) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF THE OLD TESTAMENT, THE NEW TESTAMENT AND THE KORAN WITH A VIEW TO EFFECTING A RECONCILATION BETWEEN THEM AND TO ESTABLISHING A NEW RELIGIOUS FAITH WHICH SHALL PRESERVE ND BE BASED UPON THE SACRED FUNDAMENTALS OF THE THREE SCRIPTURES AFORESAID AND WHICH SHALL BE DESIGNED TO SUPPLEMENT AND NOT TO REPLACE THE ESTABLISHED RELIGIONS. (FOR FURTHER OBJECTS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF TRUST DEED OF 18TH FEBRUARY 1955.)
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chalice House
Torridge Hill
Bideford
EX39 2AZ
- Phone:
- 01237 424737
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window