THE SLOUGH PUBLIC HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 239134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To use the income from its Investments for the benefit of the people of Slough. This is done by giving grants to the Schools of Slough for the purchase of equipment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 08 July 2024

Total income: £47,401
Total expenditure: £42,037

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Slough

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE SLOUGH PUBLIC HALL AND LEOPOLD INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Janice Mewburn-Crook Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Brian Clark Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Michael Rosedale Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Ian Griffith Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Barbara Askew Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
Rosalind Nockles Trustee 10 October 2022
None on record
JEFFREY JOHN BRANCH Trustee
THE CHARLES DAVIS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/07/2020 08/07/2021 08/07/2022 08/07/2023 08/07/2024
Total gross income £35.62k £33.53k £38.85k £43.00k £47.40k
Total expenditure £37.87k £36.11k £34.48k £30.95k £42.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 July 2024 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2024 15 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 July 2023 07 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2023 07 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 July 2022 01 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2022 01 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 08 July 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 08 July 2020 20 May 2021 12 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Ashcroft Road
MAIDENHEAD
Berkshire
SL6 6JF
Phone:
07902319205
Website:

No information available