Accounts and annual returns THE RICHMOND AND MANCHESTER CHARITY

Charity Number: 239240
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2013 26 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 26 February 2014 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2012 09 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2012 09 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2011 22 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2011 22 November 2011 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2010 22 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2010 22 September 2010 On Time