MORETON-IN-MARSH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary object of the Moreton Charity is to give relief to persons of the parish of Moreton-In-Marsh, of any age, in financial need or to help the sick, infirm or aged. Grants can take the form of direct financial assistance or the provision of specialised equipment or installations for which no form of state aid is available. All applications are treated in strict confidence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 05 February 1965: Standard registration
- POORS ALLOTMENT (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Walker | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Ledbetter | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Dawn Maull | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN HENRY CURRAN | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Berry Malcolm John | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Mark Hardy | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Sullivan | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANA MARIA WHITWORTH | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.23k | £20.79k | £23.10k | £25.96k | £26.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.67k | £10.15k | £19.95k | £42.83k | £19.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 January 2025 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 January 2025 | 63 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2024 | 309 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2024 | 309 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 9TH OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY IN INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF MORETON-IN-MARSH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS O NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
MORETON-IN-MARSH AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 stockwells
Moreton in Marsh
Gloucestershire
GL56 0HQ
- Phone:
- 01608 652095
- Email:
- ellie.hamilton69@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window