LONDON RECORD SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO EDIT, TRANSLATE AND PUBLISH THE RECORDS OF LONDON IN AN ACCESSIBLE AND SCHOLARLY FORMAT, AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY STIMULATING PUBLIC INTEREST IN ARCHIVES AND HISTORICAL MATERIAL RELATING TO LONDON
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 January 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR CAROLINE MARY BARRON | Chair | 20 October 2005 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Clare Glasser nee Wilson | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Shannon Grace McSheffrey | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Greville Dudgeon OBE DL | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John Hancock | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Louise French PhD | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rohan Allan McWilliam MA, DPhil | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penny Tucker | Trustee | 16 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR JERRY WHITE | Trustee | 27 February 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr JUSTIN COLSON | Trustee | 26 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Dr HELEN LESLEY BRADLEY | Trustee | 20 October 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.49k | £7.94k | £5.74k | £11.81k | £12.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.79k | £8.93k | £7.42k | £10.20k | £487 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2022 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 1 DECEMBER 1964 AS AMENDED 27TH NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY STIMULATING PUBLIC INTEREST IN ARCHIVES AND SIMILAR HISTORICAL MATERIAL RELATING TO LONDON.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Mill House
Harts Lane
Bawburgh
Norwich
NR9 3LS
- Phone:
- 01603745772
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window