SIR WILLIAM ROGER BROWN'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity gives small amounts of money each Christmas to poor, elderly people living in the parish of Hilperton, Wiltshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 January 1965: Standard registration
- COAL CHARITY (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SCOTT UNCLES | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAM TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID TUCKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TREVOR CARBIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHEILA SAWYER | Trustee |
|
||||||
ERNEST CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT HOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE HAYES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58 | £59 | £60 | £62 | £63 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £50 | £60 | £40 | £90 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILLPRIVED 2ND JULY 1902 (A.C. REP. WILTS VOL.1 AT P.555).
Charitable objects
THE CLEAR YEARLY INCOME TO BE USED TO PROVIDE COAL AT OR NEAR CHRISTMAS TIME FOR THE DESERVING POOR PEOPLE OF THE PARISH OF HILPERTON.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HILPERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
15A CHURCH STREET
STEEPLE ASHTON
TROWBRIDGE
BA14 6EW
- Phone:
- 01380870138
- Email:
- rockseast@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window