JOHN BRECKNELL'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising dinner
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 November 1967: Standard registration
- THE CHURCH STREET SUPPER (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Wyer | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MR NICK HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/02/2020 | 01/02/2021 | 01/02/2022 | 01/02/2023 | 01/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £100 | £400 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £252 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 February 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 4TH DECEMBER 1776 (R.V. 25 P.539)
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND GIVE TO EVERY CHILD OR UNMARRIED PERSON BORN IN OR AN INHABITANT OF CHURCH STREET, ONE TWO PENNY PLUM-CAKE UPON THE EVE OF EVERY MIDSUMMER DAY. TO PROVIDE PIPES, TOBACCO AND ALE FOR THE MALE INHABITANTS ASSEMBLED REMAINING INCOME IN SUMS OF 2/- TO 5/- TO SUCH POOR PERSONS AS THE COMPANY ASSEMBLED SHOULD THINK THE FITTEST OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CHURCH STREET KIDDERMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
H B Law (Kidderminster) Llp
7 Church Street
KIDDERMINSTER
DY10 2AD
- Phone:
- 01562702655
- Email:
- nickarhughes@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window