Trustees TREORCHY MALE CHOIR
Charity Number: 239500

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Giannotti | Chair | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Horgan | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Alan Forester | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Clements | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Michael Murphy | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Keith Wyn Jones | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth William Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mark Stanton | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Milsom | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Barrey | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Randolph Duncan McAulay | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Gough | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Williams | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.