Financial history CHARITY OF CHARITY NORRIS

Charity number: 239513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £25 £25 £57 £30 £31
Total expenditure £34 £29 £28 £28 £26
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A