Accounts and annual returns POOR'S ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 239536
Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 914 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1279 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1644 days