THE REAVELL AND PLOWMAN ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity administers and manages almshouses at 80 Clarence Road and 148 & 150 Vansittart Road, Windsor primarily for persons aged 55 years and over. Residents should be sympathetic to the Christian ethos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 13 September 1976: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN KEITH CARTER optional | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dudley Targett | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Douglas Seguin | Trustee | 09 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Colin Shearer | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|||||
LESLEY SHERWOOD optional | Trustee | 14 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
EWAN KING | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARION CUTTS optional | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANINE REBECCA AMPHLETT optional | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL EDWARDS optional | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.28k | £12.51k | £17.91k | £17.20k | £19.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.07k | £37.98k | £10.22k | £18.80k | £22.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
A) THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY AND B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 GALLYS ROAD
WINDSOR
SL4 5QY
- Phone:
- 01753859757
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window