Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF JOHN JORDAN SKINNER

Charity Number: 239617
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 28 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 15 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 March 2009 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 07 February 2007 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required