PEST HOUSE FUND

Charity Number: 239811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve cases of need of persons resident in Hadleigh who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped or infirm

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £114
Total expenditure: £100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FRANEY & RAND CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER MICHAEL MATTHEWS Chair
FRANEY RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
Rickaby Shearly-Sanders Trustee 14 December 2023
GRAND FEOFFMENT CHARITIES
Received: On time
FRANEY RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
ANN BEAUMONT'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SUSAN VERONICA MONKS Trustee 14 December 2023
None on record
Marian Hughes Trustee 09 November 2023
FRANEY RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
Margaret Jeffreys Trustee 21 November 2022
None on record
RACHAEL JANE ROGERS Trustee 01 August 2017
FRANEY RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET GOWERS Trustee 14 June 2017
FRANEY RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £427 £107 £110 £113 £114
Total expenditure £550 £0 £0 £350 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 17 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 23 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 06 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
78 BRETT GREEN
LAYHAM
IPSWICH
IP7 5LX
Phone:
01473824745
Website:

No information available