THE LANGDON CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual distribution of income November/December each year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 11 November 1969: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £316 | £262 | £261 | £244 | £236 | |
|
Total expenditure | £315 | £226 | £261 | £244 | £236 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 12 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 12 April 2013 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED WITH SIX CODICILS THERETO AT BODMIN ON 22ND FEBRUARY 1951 AND SCHEME OF THE 2ND OCTOBER 1969
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY ELDERLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, CHARDSTOCK WHO IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESSBY MAKING GRANTS OF MOENY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, CHARDSTOCK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window