JOHN DOWNER
Charity number: 239962
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable Donations at Christmas to the needy of the Parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income: £125
Total expenditure: £415
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
- Kent
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 February 1965: Standard registration
- 07 February 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- BRENCHLEY CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £360 | £140 | £240 | £320 | £125 | |
|
Total expenditure | £281 | £0 | £592 | £257 | £415 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF 4 MAY 1695
Charitable objects
INCOME FOR THE POOR OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ANCIENT PARISH OF BRENCHLEY
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL OF 17 AUGUST 1682
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR OF THE PARISH IN MONEY OR BREAD OR IN ANY OTHER CHARITABLE WAY
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BRENCHLEY
Registration history
- 09 February 1965 : Standard registration
- 07 February 2024 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window