Financial history BRABIN'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 239965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £92.98k £47.50k £169.05k £109.08k £231.29k
Total expenditure £52.20k £274.44k £145.89k £142.66k £150.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A