SIR JOHN FOWLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty. Local woman individual grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 23 February 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denis William ONeil | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edwin Cutchey | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Lavinia Manford | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CUTCHEY | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MRS MAUREEN RELF | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32 | £158 | £33 | £34 | £34 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18 JUNE 1929
Charitable objects
1) CLOTHING FOR TWO POOR WOMEN INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH. 2) $2 10. OD. IN APPRENTICING POOR CHILDREN BORN AND INHABITING WITHIN THE PARISH; ANY PART OF THE SUM OF $2 10. OD. WHICH CANNOT BE USED FOR APPRENTICING SHALL BE APPLIED INTHE ASSISTANCE OF CHILDREN WHO ARE PREPARING FOR, ENTERING UPON, OR ENGAGED IN, ANY TRADE, OCCUPATION, OR SERVICE. 3)REMAINING INCOME FOR THE REPAIR OF HIGHWAYS IN THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SANDHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
Poplar Cottage
Queen Street
Sandhurst
CRANBROOK
Kent
TN18 5HS
- Phone:
- 01580 850656
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window