THE KODAK MUTAL AID FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assists employees, ex-employees and widows/widowers of employees in times of hardship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 March 1965: Standard registration
- KMA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan White | Chair | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sharon McGowan | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £950 | £0 | £900 | £887 | £65 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1942 AND RULES
Charitable objects
TO RECEIVE AND COLLECT FUNDS AND APPLY THE SAME FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE PURPOSE OF GIVING RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE IN CASES OF SICKNESS, ILL-HEALTH OR MISFORTUNE TO EMPLOYEES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS OF KODAK LIMITED AND ITS SUBSIDIARY COMPANIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kodak
Building 8
Hatters Lane
Watford
WD18 8PX
- Phone:
- 01923652713
- Email:
- sharon.mcgowan@kodak.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window