THE HENRY ANDREW WILLIAM COCKS CHARITY

Charity Number: 240158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide housing primarily for elderly people from Middleton St George.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £23,965
Total expenditure: £138,398

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Darlington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GISELA WHEELER Chair 06 February 2002
None on record
Michael Andrew Wilson Trustee 21 March 2023
None on record
Stephen York Trustee 21 March 2023
None on record
James Wayman Edwards Trustee 18 February 2022
None on record
Helen Crosby Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
ANN BOLTON Trustee 08 February 2005
None on record
DEBORAH LAING Trustee
MIDDLETON ST GEORGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.81k £22.81k £21.94k £23.09k £23.97k
Total expenditure £24.34k £22.28k £28.56k £35.22k £138.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Thorntree Farm
Neasham Road
Middleton St. George
DARLINGTON
DL2 1DR
Phone:
01325333324
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available