COME BACK TO GOD CAMPAIGN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make known the Gospel of the Lord Jesus Christ and spread the knowledge of the Scriptures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 March 1965: Standard registration
- 26 March 2019: Funds received from 1097082 BETHEL CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY
- ADELAIDE COLLEGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marilyn Paterson | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachael Caroline Orme | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARION DENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.73k | £81.66k | £95.23k | £87.94k | £62.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.97k | £83.66k | £85.75k | £79.26k | £69.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 November 2022 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 19TH JUNE 1961
Charitable objects
(1) TO BRING THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST TO THE MASSES OF PEOPLE WHO ATTEND NO PLACE OF WORSHIP.(2) TO DO SO IN CO-OPERATION AND EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN CHURCHES OF ANY DENOMINATION WHO ARE INSPIRED BY THE SAME DESIRE AND HOLD THE DOCTRINES SET FORTH IN THE SCHEDULE.(FOR FULLER DETAILS SEE TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ADELAIDE COLLEGE
3 NINEYARD STREET
SALTCOATS
KA21 5HS
- Phone:
- 01294463911
- Email:
- admin@comebacktogod.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window