POOR'S ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial support to the needy of Trimley St. Martin from the funds obtained from the interest on investments and allotment rents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 April 1965: Standard registration
- ALLOTMENTS CHARITY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Paul Ian Clarke | Chair | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Parker | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Whitworth | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nina Davis | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Anderson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £817 | £1.28k | £711 | £834 | £1.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181 | £516 | £328 | £614 | £84 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 August 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 August 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARD DATED THE 13TH NOVEMBER 1807 ACT 45 GEO III C2 AND SCHEME OF THE 9TH AUGUST 1966
Charitable objects
INCOME APPLIED AS THE TUSTEES THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFTIT EITHER OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF TRIMLEY ST. MARTIN GENERALLY OR OF SUCH POOR PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS THEY SELECT.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF TRIMLEY ST MARTIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 MILL CLOSE
TRIMLEY ST MARTIN
FELIXSTOWE
FELIXSTOWE
Suffolk
IP11 0RW
- Phone:
- 07791 135596
- Email:
- andersons.catcity@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window