THE BERKELEY TRUST

Charity Number: 240341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of the poor and help with the upkeep of the churchyard.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £156
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 May 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Neil Andrew Taylor Trustee 06 October 2020
CHARITY OF MISS ELLINOR ROLLESTON
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARY RAYNER
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £92 £192 £196 £154 £156
Total expenditure £0 £0 £925 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 December 2023 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 April 2022 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
52 Epping Road
Toot Hill
ONGAR
Essex
CM5 9SQ
Phone:
01277 532770
Website:

No information available