CLOTHING CHARITY

Charity Number: 240345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Lymm Clothing Charity has responsibility for the management of several long standing investment endowments, dating back to the 17th century, income from these investments is distributed annually to needy residents of the parishes of Lymm & Oughtrington, subject to satisfactory completion of an application form. There is also provision for one off payments at any time for special cases.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,543
Total expenditure: £870

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Warrington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LYMM CLOTHING CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kath Buckley Chair 01 May 2023
WARRINGTON DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU
Received: On time
JULIA LEIGH Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Benjamin Selwood Trustee 17 November 2016
None on record
Joseph Ranson Trustee 30 August 2013
None on record
David Thomas Wright Trustee 27 April 2012
None on record
JULIE BURGESS Trustee 31 March 2009
None on record
RAYMOND EDWARD BROADSMITH Trustee
None on record
Rev EDWIN MICHAEL BURGESS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.80k £11.51k £1.22k £1.57k £1.54k
Total expenditure £2.07k £30 £100 £20 £870
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 May 2024 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 February 2022 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 29.08.1916 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 24.07.1931 AND 13.04.1951
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF LYMM
Registration history
  • 08 March 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
4 Manor Road
LYMM
Cheshire
WA13 0AY
Phone:
07592 725550
Website:

No information available