PAYCARE CHARITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide equipment and amenities to aid the treatment and recovery of patients in hospital, or in places of care and to assist with medical research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 April 1965: Standard registration
- 29 March 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE PATIENTS' AID ASSOCIATION HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CHARITIES TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.69k | £31.07k | £31.59k | £31.35k | £705 | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.78k | £36.15k | £34.42k | £32.82k | £41.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 15 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 25 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 25 March 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 19 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 19 March 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 20 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 10 April 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1964 AND EFFECTED BY SCHEME OF 30TH JANUARY 1998 AS AMENDED 6 MAY 1998, 25 FEBRUARY 2004 AND 7TH DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
ANY CHARITABLE OBJECTS CONNECTED WITH THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window