Accounts and annual returns THE SOUTHCOTE CHRISTIAN MISSION

Charity number: 240417
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 12 November 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 12 November 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 15 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 15 November 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 27 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 27 October 2011 On Time