THE SOUTHCOTE CHRISTIAN MISSION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support Christian organisations on both local, national and international basis. We provide financial aid, resources and assistance to several organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Reading
Governance
- 25 March 1965: Standard registration
- 17 July 2014: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 17 July 2014: Funds transferred to 1156292 SOUTHCOTE FAMILY CHURCH
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.18k | £51.70k | £51.32k | £61.64k | £56.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.91k | £61.25k | £43.93k | £60.64k | £51.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 12 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 12 November 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 15 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 15 November 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 27 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 27 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8TH DECEMBER 1964.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELGION AND IN PARTICULAR THE HOLDING OF SERVICES AND THE PROCLAMATION AND TEACHING OF GOSPEL TRUTH IN THE MISSION HALL OR OTHER PREMISES OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
READING.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window