Financial history CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 240445
Charity reporting is up to date (202 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.32k £20.48k £11.96k £17.29k £20.44k
Total expenditure £12.28k £36.78k £56.06k £65.29k £95.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A