THE JOHN SPEDAN LEWIS FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide finance for charitable purposes reflecting the interests of John Spedan Lewis, notably entomology, ornithology, horticulture and associated environmental education and conservation projects. Appeals are accepted from charities for which natural history topics are explicitly stated among their charitable purposes, including wildlife conservation, entomology, ornithology and horticulture
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 February 1969: Standard registration
- 01 August 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 01 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1118162 John Lewis Partnership Foundation
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.47k | £100.40k | £74.95k | £75.17k | £88.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.67k | £65.91k | £134.88k | £45.09k | £75.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH DECEMBER 1964
Charitable objects
FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING PAYMENTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AND INSTITUTIONS, TRUSTS AND UNDERTAKINGS ESTABLISHED EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window