Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY OF THE SERVANTS OF THE CROSS

Charity number: 240474
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 February 2019 475 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 April 2018 157 days late
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 13 October 2016 On Time