EBBESBOURNE WAKE - KING'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To receive investment income and to make grants to people in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 18 February 1969: Standard registration
- EBBESBOURNE WAKE-KINGS CHARITY (Working name)
- The Alvediston, Ebbesbourne Wake & Fifield Bavant Fund (known as The Alfiwake Fund) (Working name)
- EBBESBOURNE WAKE POOR'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- POOR'S ALLOTMENTS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Francis Richard Boys | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carly Marie Stainforth | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Anne Watts | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Whitfield | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANINE NOEL HILLARY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOCTOR HUGH PELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.46k | £1.49k | £1.45k | £1.42k | £1.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £980 | £366 | £1.59k | £1.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 9TH MAY 1990 AND LETTER OF CONCURRENCE DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1994 as amended on 29 Jun 2022 as amended on 24 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF EBBESBOURNE WAKE AND ALVEDISTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
EBBESBOURNE WAKE AND ALVEDISTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rivendell
Ebbesbourne Wake
SALISBURY
SP5 5JB
- Phone:
- 01722780796
- Email:
- rosewhitfield@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window