CHARITY KNOWN AS THE BREAD MONEY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bread distribution to poor children of Haselbech
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 04 March 1965: Standard registration
- 21 May 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 09 April 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 05 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 23 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 21ST MARCH 1884.
Charitable objects
DISTRIBUTION OF BREAD TO:- (1) POOR PERSONS WHOSE CHILDREN ATTEDN, AND SHALL HAVE ATTENDED FOR NOT LESS THAN ONE YEAR NEXT PRECEDING SUCH DISTRIBUTION, AT SOME PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH,AND WHO SHALL HAVE RECEIVED FROM THE PRINCIPAL TEACHER OF THE SCHOOL SUCH CERTIFICATE IN WRITING OF THEIR GOOD CONDUCT REGULARITY IN ATTENDANCE, AND POFICIENCY DURING THAT PERIDO AS SHALL BE SATISFACTORY T THE TRUSTEES; AND (2) DESERVING POOR WIDOWS, BEING INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH, WHO ARE NOT IN RECEIPT OF PAROCHIAL RELIEF.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HASELBECH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window