INGATESTONE AND FRYERNING COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Community Trust owns Ingatestone Community Centre and Fryerning Parish Room to provide facilities for recreation and leisure-time occupation for the inhabitants of Ingatestone & Fryerning. The affairs of the Trust are managed by the Ingatestone and Fryerning Community Association (Registered Charity No. 268700) and the Executive Committee of the Association are the trustees of the Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 25 March 1965: Standard registration
- 29 March 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1161482 INGATESTONE & FRYERNING COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION CIO
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 10 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 10 February 2017 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 21 November 2015 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 21 November 2015 | 479 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 4TH DECEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHOF INGATESTONE AND FRYERNING FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF INGATESTONE AND FRYERNING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window