Financial history MALDEN AND CUDDINGTON JUBILEE CLUB AND INSTITUTE

Charity number: 240542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.09k £16.53k £20.34k £27.36k £25.56k
Total expenditure £18.97k £13.03k £26.27k £13.35k £36.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A