WILLIAM ANTHONY WATSON

Charity number: 240556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity helps relieve poverty. Makes grants to individuals and helps the general public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £463
Total expenditure: £3,600

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 March 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Russell Trustee 14 March 2023
THOMPSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ASHOVER GENERAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
HARRIETTE HOLWELL WATERHOUSE
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOHN EVANS
Received: On time
THE KAYE JACKSON DOLE OR CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF JOSEPH BASSETT
Received: On time
Andrew Dean Hardwick Trustee 14 March 2023
THOMPSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ASHOVER GENERAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
HARRIETTE HOLWELL WATERHOUSE
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOHN EVANS
Received: On time
THE KAYE JACKSON DOLE OR CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF JOSEPH BASSETT
Received: On time
Rev Peter Edward Bold Trustee 14 March 2023
THOMPSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ASHOVER GENERAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
HARRIETTE HOLWELL WATERHOUSE
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOHN EVANS
Received: On time
THE KAYE JACKSON DOLE OR CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF JOSEPH BASSETT
Received: On time
The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of All Saints Ashover and St. Mark's Handley
Received: 152 days late
Sarah Jane Evans Trustee 05 March 2023
THOMPSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HARRIETTE HOLWELL WATERHOUSE
Received: On time
CHARITY OF JOHN EVANS
Received: On time
THE KAYE JACKSON DOLE OR CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF JOSEPH BASSETT
Received: On time
The Parochial Church Council of the Ecclesiastical Parish of All Saints Ashover and St. Mark's Handley
Received: 152 days late
ASHOVER GENERAL CHARITIES
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £393 £403 £424 £623 £463
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £2.80k £3.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 27 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 March 2023 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Rectory
Narrowleys Lane
Ashover
Chesterfield
S45 0AU
Phone:
01246590246
Website:

No information available