Accounts and annual returns JOHN THOMAS HOOD TRUST

Charity Number: 240663
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 30 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 18 November 2008 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 13 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 16 February 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2004 24 February 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required