Financial history JOHN THOMAS HOOD TRUST

Charity Number: 240663
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008
Total gross income £557 £3.95k £1.19k £682 £721
Total expenditure £550 £504 £5.91k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A