Register of Charities - The Charity Commission MAIDSTONE GRAMMAR GIRLS GENERAL PRIZE FUND
Charity number: 307837-2
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST OF 10 MAY 1947 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 DECEMBER 2008 (CONCURRED WITH BY THE COMMISSION ON 14 JULY 2009)
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE MAIDSTONE GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR GIRLS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF AWARDS AND PRIZES IN SUBJECTS/AREAS OF SCHOOL LIFE AS AGREED BY THE HEAD TEACHER AND GOVERNORS AS TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
MAIDSTONE, KENT
Registration history
- 17 January 1964: Standard registration
- 23 August 2010: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Other names
- MARY CLARK HISTORY PRIZE FUND (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.