THE WENHAM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide income and capital for religious or other charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW ROLAND VELLACOTT | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARY EVANGELINE VELLACOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.13k | £2.31k | £194 | £27 | £94 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.13k | £3.65k | £867 | £31.63k | £18.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 106 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 472 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 July 2021 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND JANUARY, 1965.
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR WORK WHICH SHALL BE ESTABLISHED OR MAINTAINED FOR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES:-1) THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR EDUCATION. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE PROTESTANT AND EVANGELICAL TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. 3) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MISSIONARY ACTIVITY DESIGNED FOR THE SPREAD OF SUCH CHRISTIAN FAITH. 4) THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY. 5) THE HELP AND COMFORT OF THE SICK AND AGED. 6) GENERALLY THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE WENHAM TRUST
Stretham House
The Street
Earl Soham
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 7SF
- Phone:
- 01728685423
- Email:
- maryvellacott@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window