Trustees CHARITY KNOWN AS THE WELFORD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 240995

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY RICHARD NEWMAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Denise Cattell | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Phelan | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Henry Brown | Trustee | 15 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mary Crowther | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ann Margaret Thorington | Trustee | 01 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE ANNE AINSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIFFORD EDWARD WILKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN FRANCESCA LEES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIA NEWMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.