THE ALICE GOUGH MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide accomodation to men and women who are in need of assistance and who have resided or been employed in the Parish of Easthampstead or the new Parish of Bracknell for period of not less than fifteen years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bracknell Forest
Governance
- 14 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs Penny Thompson | Chair | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stacey | Trustee | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Nichola Susan Folley | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Beardmore | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115.19k | £77.41k | £90.64k | £103.46k | £137.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.78k | £57.66k | £70.23k | £110.53k | £104.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND FEBRUARY 1965
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF HOMES FOR MEN AND WOMEN OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND WHO HAVE RESIDED OR BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA FOR A PERIOD OF NOT LESS THAN FIFTEEN YEARS AT ANY ONE TIME.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EASTHAMPSTEAD AND NEW PARISH OF BRACKNELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
5B Alice Gough Memorial Homes
Crowthorne Road
BRACKNELL
Berkshire
RG12 7DR
- Phone:
- 013443266911
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window