Financial history THE PEOPLE'S HALL

Charity number: 241032
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £26.82k £35.02k £40.29k £39.48k £61.25k
Total expenditure £11.87k £35.46k £39.30k £46.98k £72.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A