ASHBY FOLVILLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village functions. Council meetings (parish). W.I. meeting. Upholstery classes. Childrens parties. Church functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 05 May 1965: Standard registration
- ASHBY PARISH VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew John Pickering | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Farmer | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
LUCY STROUD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEX STROUD | Trustee |
|
||||||
KEVIN JOHN TROOP | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.54k | £10.66k | £13.43k | £16.75k | £3.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.06k | £3.54k | £9.07k | £19.95k | £3.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.60k | £9.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2023 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2023 | 521 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2023 | 886 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 May 2021 | 206 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 OCTOBER 1959
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL USED AS A PLACE OF RECREATION AND SOCIAL INTERCOURSE FOR THE ADVANTAGE OR BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
ASHBY FOLVILLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Folville Street
Ashby Folville
MELTON MOWBRAY
Leicestershire
LE14 2TE
- Phone:
- 07557790636
- Email:
- farmer893@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
n.a
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window