FARM AND RURAL BUILDINGS CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 04 March 1965: Standard registration
- 28 April 1995: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH APRIL 1964 AS AMENDED 16TH JULY 1975 AND 16TH MARCH 1988
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND PROMOTE AGRICULTURE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND WITH A VIEW THERETO TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST THE STUDY OF AND INSTRUCTION IN THE DESIGN, DEVELOPMENT, AND IMPROVEMENT OF FARM BUILDINGS. (FOR DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.