ROTARY CLUB OF CHRISTCHURCH CHARITIES FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping in the community both financially and in kind, in the support of other charitable objects and in particular the young and the elderly
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 10 March 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN ELLSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Howard Matthews | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marianne Abley | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mills | Trustee | 14 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Cherry | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|||||
DAVID ROBERT HANCOCK | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PETER BOARDMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.76k | £78.24k | £16.94k | £37.51k | £20.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.49k | £132.72k | £107.73k | £52.88k | £29.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND DECEMBER 1964.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE COMFORTS EITHER IN CASH OR KIND FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED POOR AND LONELY PERSONS RESIDING WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF CHRISTCHURCH AND SUCH PARTS OF THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT AS ARE INCLUDED IN THE MEMBERSHIP AREA OF THE CLUB AND TO MAKE CONTRIBUTIONS TO OTHER CHARITABLE AND BENEVOLENT ORGANISATIONS DIRECTED TO THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE RECONGNISED FOR SUPPORT BY THE COUNCIL FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE CHRISTCHURCH ROTARY CLUB.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CHRISTCHURCH AND DISTRICT.
Linked charities
- 10 March 1965 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 BARING ROAD
BOURNEMOUTH
BH6 4DT
- Phone:
- 01202420472
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window